SD SB168 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require that newborns be screened for congenital heart defects.
Title
Require that newborns be screened for congenital heart defects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 738 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-27 | House | Signed by President S.J. 615 |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 551 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 476 |
2013-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 305 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 313 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 296 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 276 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Deferred by Chair, Passed |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 176 |