SD SB167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify the certification process for teachers and school administrators.
Title
Clarify the certification process for teachers and school administrators.
Sponsors
Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] | Sen. David Wheeler [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Sen. Red Foster [D] |
Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Michael Rohl [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 543 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 495 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 488 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 464 |
2022-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 521 |
2022-03-01 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 507 |
2022-02-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-25 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167D |
2022-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 404 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 295 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167B |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 128 |