SD SB167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a legislative study to study offenses regarding controlled substances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish a legislative study to study offenses regarding controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
2019-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 756
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 716
2019-03-12HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 693
2019-03-11HouseSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 679
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 691 Amendment 167wtc
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 17. H.J. 691
2019-03-04HouseJudiciary Title amended, Passed H.J. 598 Amendment 167wtb
2019-03-04HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
2019-03-04HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167wc
2019-03-04HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167wb
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 552
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 505
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed S.J. 442 Amendment 167wta
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167wa
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed Amendment 167jta
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167ja
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 229

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=167&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB167P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB167SAP.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB167HJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB167H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB167ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28559&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28796&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29081&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29337&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29442&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback