SD SB167 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding the consideration of joint physical custody of a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding the consideration of joint physical custody of a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseSigned by the Governor on March 6, 2018 S.J. 738
2018-03-01HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 01, 2018 S.J. 660
2018-02-28HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 653
2018-02-27HouseSigned by the President S.J. 623
2018-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 603
2018-02-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-23HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 569
2018-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 371
2018-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 392
2018-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 366
2018-02-01SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 314
2018-02-01SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 167ka
2018-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 246

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=167&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB167P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB167SJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB167ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25166&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25166&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25443&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26307&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26410&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback