SD SB166 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 8, NAYS 27. S.J. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding hate crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 8, NAYS 27. S.J. 342
2021-02-24SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 342 Amendment 166D
2021-02-23SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 329
2021-02-18SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 4
2021-02-18SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 4 Amendment 166B
2021-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-11SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 3 Amendment 166A
2021-02-11SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 142

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback