SD SB166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a transfer of funds for the postsecondary scholarship grant fund and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide a transfer of funds for the postsecondary scholarship grant fund and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 423 |
2020-02-26 | House | First Reading House H.J. 409 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 342 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 166A |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 154 |