SD SB166 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the number of years that permits to carry a concealed weapon are valid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the number of years that permits to carry a concealed weapon are valid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-25HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 756
2013-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 712
2013-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 773
2013-03-05HouseSigned by President S.J. 688
2013-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 0. H.J. 638
2013-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 597
2013-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 585
2013-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 559
2013-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535
2013-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507
2013-02-21HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 477
2013-02-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2013-02-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 406
2013-02-13SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 394
2013-02-12SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 383
2013-02-07SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 364
2013-02-06SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 340
2013-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2013-01-23SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 175

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback