SD SB165 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 36-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Government Operations and Audit Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. H.J. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - Government Operations and Audit Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. H.J. 642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Develop a systematic process for the performance management review of state agencies.
Title
Develop a systematic process for the performance management review of state agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Phyllis Heineman [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] |
Sen. Ried Holien [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Chuck Jones [R] |
Sen. Thomas Jones [D] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] | Sen. Daniel Lederman [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Sen. David Omdahl [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] |
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Sen. Bill Van Gerpen [R] | Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Sen. Chuck Welke [D] | Sen. Jim White [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Lance Carson [R] |
Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Rep. Don Haggar [R] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Rep. Scott Munsterman [R] |
Sen. David Novstrup [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] |
Rep. Steve Westra [R] | Rep. Hal Wick [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Government Operations and Audit Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Government Operations and Audit Do Pass (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Government Operations and Audit Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. H.J. 642 |
2014-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Government Operations and Audit H.J. 533 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 436 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Government Operations and Audit Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 3, NAYS 2. S.J. 397 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Government Operations and Audit Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 2. |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Government Operations and Audit S.J. 198 |