SD SB162 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for the erection of the South Dakota Sioux Code Talker Memorial and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for the erection of the South Dakota Sioux Code Talker Memorial and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Joint - Tabled (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-22 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-20 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 180 |