SD SB161 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the qualifications to serve as a trustee of a county road district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the qualifications to serve as a trustee of a county road district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 483
2021-03-02HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-03-02HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
2021-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 400
2021-02-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 357
2021-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 304
2021-02-17SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
2021-02-17SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-02-17SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 161A
2021-02-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 143

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback