SD SB16 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 409
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-14 - Signed by Governor S.J. 409
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize licensure of persons graduating from social work programs that are in candidacy status.
Title
Authorize licensure of persons graduating from social work programs that are in candidacy status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Signed by Governor S.J. 409 | |
2011-02-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 399 | |
2011-02-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 347 | |
2011-02-08 | Signed by President S.J. 366 | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 305 | |
2011-02-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 282 | |
2011-02-01 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-01 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 242 | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 131 | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 154 | |
2011-01-19 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 141 | |
2011-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 18 |