SD SB158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Joint Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. S.J. 517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for increased reimbursement for care of residents of nursing facilities and assisted living facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for increased reimbursement for care of residents of nursing facilities and assisted living facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. S.J. 517
2019-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 363
2019-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services, Passed S.J. 317
2019-01-30SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 227

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback