SD SB158 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to restitution in cases involving juveniles and to declare an emergency.
Title
Revise provisions related to restitution in cases involving juveniles and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 836 |
2016-03-07 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-07 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 785 |
2016-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 634 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 403 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 403 Amendment 158xa |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 354 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 215 |