SD SB158 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain funding provisions of the building South Dakota fund.
Title
Revise certain funding provisions of the building South Dakota fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 781 |
2014-03-14 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 675 |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by President S.J. 673 |
2014-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 18. H.J. 769 |
2014-03-13 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 764 Amendment Cc158 |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 666 |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 658 Amendment Cc158 |
2014-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 743 |
2014-03-12 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 642 |
2014-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 6. H.J. 712 |
2014-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 685 |
2014-03-05 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 643 |
2014-03-05 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 158ad |
2014-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 576 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 455 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 402 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 158aa |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 197 |