SD SB158 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create an exception to the loan or credit limitations of state chartered banks.
Title
Create an exception to the loan or credit limitations of state chartered banks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Signed by Governor S.J. 672 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624 | |
2012-02-28 | Signed by President S.J. 605 | |
2012-02-27 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 632 | |
2012-02-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 610 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-14 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 459 | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 388 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-09 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 332 | |
2012-02-09 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 158ja | |
2012-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 172 |