SD SB157 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2015-02-20 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 470
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to the state aeronautics fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to the state aeronautics fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate Appropriations Tabled (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-20SenateAppropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 470
2015-02-20SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-02-06SenateDeferred by Chair
2015-02-06SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 217

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback