SD SB157 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 24. H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 24. H.J. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to outdoor advertising signs.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to outdoor advertising signs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Veto override (Y: 43 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Commerce and Energy (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Commerce and Energy (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 43, NAYS 24. H.J. 742 | |
2012-03-19 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 7. S.J. 676 | |
2012-03-19 | Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 673 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 718 | |
2012-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 648 | |
2012-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 647 | |
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 27. H.J. 711 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 9. S.J. 632 | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 624 Amendment cc157A | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 676 Amendment Cc157A | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 556 | |
2012-02-24 | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 609 | |
2012-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 584 | |
2012-02-23 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 33. H.J. 583 Amendment 157fb | |
2012-02-22 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 544 | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to House Commerce and Energy, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 501 | |
2012-02-10 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 414 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 9. S.J. 344 | |
2012-02-08 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 309 | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | Re-referred to Senate Transportation, Passed S.J. 200 | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 172 |