SD SB155 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for programs that assist victims of domestic violence, abuse, and neglect and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for programs that assist victims of domestic violence, abuse, and neglect and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6 (Y: 57 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 S.J. 544 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2022 S.J. 495 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 488 |
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 621 |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 12. H.J. 600 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed |
2022-03-03 | House | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7) House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 573 |
2022-03-03 | House | Committee on Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 1 |
2022-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 465 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 332 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 155B |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 239 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 129 |