SD SB155 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 45-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for step therapy protocol regarding certain prescription drugs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for step therapy protocol regarding certain prescription drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 583
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 S.J. 488
2020-03-09HouseSigned by the President S.J. 470
2020-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 494
2020-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477
2020-03-03HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-03-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-27HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 423
2020-02-25HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 387
2020-02-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 323
2020-02-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 305
2020-02-20SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 292
2020-02-19SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 254
2020-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 238
2020-02-12SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
2020-02-12SenateState Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 155B
2020-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-05SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 141

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback