SD SB154 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 785
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 785
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a penalty for fleeing from a law enforcement officer.
Title
Provide a penalty for fleeing from a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Sen. Lee Schoenbeck [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 785 |
2016-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 634 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 403 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 354 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 214 |