SD SB153 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - No motion to place on calendar S.J. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - No motion to place on calendar S.J. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for drug testing certain TANF applicants.
Title
Provide for drug testing certain TANF applicants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Not Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | No motion to place on calendar S.J. 411 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Not Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 378 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 337 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 214 |