SD SB152 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize counties to issue off-sale liquor licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize counties to issue off-sale liquor licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-10SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468
2021-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 541
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 469
2021-03-01HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-17HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 304
2021-02-16SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 266
2021-02-10SenateLocal Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2021-02-10SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 152C
2021-02-10SenateLocal Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 152B
2021-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 134

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback