SD SB152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enact the Peter Falk Act to ensure visitation of certain protected persons.
Title
Enact the Peter Falk Act to ensure visitation of certain protected persons.
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Rep. Blaine Campbell [R] | Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 14, 2016 S.J. 618 |
2016-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2016 S.J. 585 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 845 |
2016-03-08 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 577 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 7. H.J. 798 |
2016-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 766 |
2016-03-01 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 730 |
2016-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 634 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 404 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 373 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 214 |