SD SB151 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation to provide for infrastructure to support Ellsworth Air Force Base and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation to provide for infrastructure to support Ellsworth Air Force Base and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Referred to (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02JointCommittee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4.
2021-03-02JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-24JointCommittee on Appropriations Deferred to another day, Passed J.J. 1
2021-02-24JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 8. J.J. 1
2021-02-24JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 135

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback