SD SB151 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the appointment process for the State Veterans Home superintendent.
Title
Revise the appointment process for the State Veterans Home superintendent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 580 |
2014-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 544 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 638 |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by President S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 591 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 565 |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 375 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 268 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-07 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 253 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 186 |