SD SB151 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the grandfathering provisions and renewal requirements of massage therapy licensure.
Title
Revise the grandfathering provisions and renewal requirements of massage therapy licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 682 | |
2011-03-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 706 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 663 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 625 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 600 Amendment 151jta | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 599 | |
2011-03-02 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 599 Amendment 151ja | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 555 | |
2011-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 508 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-15 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 395 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 15. S.J. 418 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 402 | |
2011-02-09 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 373 | |
2011-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-07 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-02 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 226 |