SD SB150 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions related to the legislative intern program.
Title
Revise provisions related to the legislative intern program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 S.J. 596 |
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 S.J. 560 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 534 |
2016-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 31. H.J. 765 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743 |
2016-02-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723 |
2016-02-25 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 700 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 431 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 2. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 150rc |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 213 |