SD SB149 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide certain protections to faith-based or religious child-placement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide certain protections to faith-based or religious child-placement agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseSigned by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 746
2017-03-10HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 727
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the President S.J. 710
2017-03-09HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 739
2017-03-07HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 657
2017-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 20. H.J. 611
2017-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 611 Amendment 149bc
2017-03-01HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 586
2017-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-24HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 535
2017-02-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 500
2017-02-22SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 12. S.J. 507
2017-02-22SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 506 Amendment 149cb
2017-02-16SenateDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 418
2017-02-15SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 394
2017-02-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-08SenateDeferred by Chair
2017-02-08SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 250

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=149&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB149P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB149S.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB149H.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/SB149ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23324&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23564&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23889&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24037&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24127&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments

feedback