SD SB148 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 S.J. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 S.J. 512
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide permissive authority to a governing body of a municipality or county to deny reissuance of an on-sale license not actively used.
Title
Provide permissive authority to a governing body of a municipality or county to deny reissuance of an on-sale license not actively used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2024 S.J. 512 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 29, 2024 S.J. 455 |
2024-02-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 432 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 435 |
2024-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 399 |
2024-02-23 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-23 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 261 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 257 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 166 |