SD SB148 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 472
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the crime of torture of a human trafficking victim and provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Establish the crime of torture of a human trafficking victim and provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Motion to amend (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 472 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2021 S.J. 468 |
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 445 |
2021-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 495 |
2021-03-03 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2021-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 400 |
2021-02-24 | House | First Reading House H.J. 383 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 331 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 5 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 2 Amendment 148A |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 134 |