SD SB147 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 450
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit collective bargaining by certain employees of the Board of Regents.
Title
Prohibit collective bargaining by certain employees of the Board of Regents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 47 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 450 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498 |
2020-03-04 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 421 |
2020-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 19. H.J. 456 |
2020-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. |
2020-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 423 |
2020-02-26 | House | First Reading House H.J. 409 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 14. S.J. 342 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 119 |