SD SB147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-5)
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 728
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 27 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 728
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to domestic abuse and protection orders.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to domestic abuse and protection orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 728 |
2013-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 3. H.J. 771 |
2013-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 756 Amendment Cc147A |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 695 Amendment cc147A |
2013-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 689 |
2013-03-04 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 644 |
2013-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 18. H.J. 574 |
2013-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 573 Amendment 147oa |
2013-02-26 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 559 |
2013-02-22 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 507 |
2013-02-22 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 147rc |
2013-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 326 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 331 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 288 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 147ra |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 171 |