SD SB146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal provisions related to threatening persons holding statewide office, judicial officers, and elected officers and to provide a penalty therefor.
Title
Revise and repeal provisions related to threatening persons holding statewide office, judicial officers, and elected officers and to provide a penalty therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Mellissa Heermann [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] | Rep. Byron Callies [R] |
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Becky Drury [R] | Rep. Mary Fitzgerald [R] | Rep. Trish Ladner [R] |
Sen. Carl Perry [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2024 S.J. 501 |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 495 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 500 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 10. S.J. 484 |
2024-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 464 |
2024-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 464 Amendment 146F |
2024-02-28 | House | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-28 | House | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 146E |
2024-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 355 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 10. S.J. 345 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 146C |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 166 |