SD SB146 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding eligibility for parole for certain persons sentenced to life imprisonment.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding eligibility for parole for certain persons sentenced to life imprisonment.
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] | Rep. Erin Healy [D] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] |
Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 1 |
2021-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 294 |
2021-02-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 284 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 239 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 239 Amendment 146B |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 134 |