SD SB145 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain qualifications for the South Dakota opportunity scholarship program.
Title
Revise certain qualifications for the South Dakota opportunity scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 608 | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 755 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by President S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 545 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 640 | |
2010-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 618 | |
2010-02-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 606 | |
2010-02-22 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 500 | |
2010-02-22 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 145cb | |
2010-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-17 | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 448 | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 340 | |
2010-02-11 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 289 | |
2010-02-11 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 145ca | |
2010-02-11 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 169 |