SD SB144 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 536
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 536
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create the road improvement priority fund, provide for the distribution of the fund, make an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Create the road improvement priority fund, provide for the distribution of the fund, make an appropriation, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Failed to concur (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Placed on calendar (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Failed to concur (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Placed on calendar (Y: 50 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 536 |
2020-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 605 |
2020-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 595 |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 524 |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 4. S.J. 489 |
2020-03-10 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 542 |
2020-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 542 |
2020-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 540 Amendment 144G |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on calendar, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 17. H.J. 539 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 35. H.J. 514 |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 144D |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 422 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 359 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 359 Amendment 144C |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment 144B |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 116 |