SD SB143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding informational directional signing on the interstate right-of-way.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding informational directional signing on the interstate right-of-way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to strike the "without recommendation" (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Motion to strike the "without recommendation" (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Report out of committee without recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 699 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 719 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 718 Amendment 143ob |
2013-02-28 | House | Transportation Title amended, Passed Amendment 143jta |
2013-02-28 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 590 |
2013-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 480 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 447 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 447 Amendment 143oa |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Motion to strike the "without recommendation", Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 413 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Transportation Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 388 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 143oa |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 170 |