SD SB143 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 28. S.J. 491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 28. S.J. 491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow artisan distillers and farm wineries to sell certain distilled spirits to wholesalers and retailers.
Title
Allow artisan distillers and farm wineries to sell certain distilled spirits to wholesalers and retailers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 28. S.J. 491 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 490 Amendment 143fg | |
2011-02-17 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 462 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-15 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 200 |