SD SB141 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed H.J. 622
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establish provisions for the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Establish provisions for the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed H.J. 622 |
2022-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 586 |
2022-03-01 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 467 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 339 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 130 |