SD SB141 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-24 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 440
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the distribution of petroleum release compensation and tank inspection fees, to provide funding for the local bridge improvement grant fund, and to repeal the state capital construction fund, ethanol fuel fund, and ethanol infrastructure incentive fund.
Title
Revise the distribution of petroleum release compensation and tank inspection fees, to provide funding for the local bridge improvement grant fund, and to repeal the state capital construction fund, ethanol fuel fund, and ethanol infrastructure incentive fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 440 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 14. S.J. 440 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 432 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 432 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 387 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141fc |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 194 |