SD SB141 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-10 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accommodate legislation on medical services.
Title
Accommodate legislation on medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 710 |
2015-03-09 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 648 |
2015-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 516 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 495 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 480 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 446 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 432 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 214 |