SD SB141 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 25. H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 25. H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the legal definition of the term, domestic abuse.
Title
Revise the legal definition of the term, domestic abuse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted (Y: 39 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 35 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 25. H.J. 716 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 640 Amendment cc141A | |
2012-03-01 | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 708 Amendment Cc141A | |
2012-02-29 | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 627 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 680 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 22. H.J. 657 | |
2012-02-28 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 33. H.J. 656 Amendment 141ya | |
2012-02-27 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 628 | |
2012-02-27 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141rd | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-24 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-02-24 | Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 359 | |
2012-02-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 302 | |
2012-02-02 | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 141jta | |
2012-02-02 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 256 | |
2012-02-02 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 141rb | |
2012-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-31 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-31 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 156 |