SD SB141 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 596
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain alcohol consumption related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.
Title
Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain alcohol consumption related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Judiciary Tabled (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 596 | |
2011-03-02 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 8. | |
2011-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-28 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141rd | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 514 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 505 | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 464 | |
2011-02-17 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 141rc | |
2011-02-17 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 141rb | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 200 |