SD SB141 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish certain provisions regarding documents or instruments filed with the register of deeds that may contain personally identifiable information and to revise certain format requirements relating to real estate documents filed with the register of deeds.
Title
Establish certain provisions regarding documents or instruments filed with the register of deeds that may contain personally identifiable information and to revise certain format requirements relating to real estate documents filed with the register of deeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 847 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 628 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 752 Amendment 141fta | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 751 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 750 Amendment 141fa | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-03 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 | |
2010-02-25 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 384 | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 312 | |
2010-02-10 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 274 | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 168 |