SD SB140 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to voter registration.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Kolbeck [R] | Rep. Tina Mulally [R] | Sen. Casey Crabtree [R] | Rep. Taylor Rehfeldt [R] |
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2023 S.J. 495 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2023 S.J. 442 |
2023-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 489 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 417 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 387 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 392 |
2023-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 392 Amendment 140H |
2023-02-24 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 374 |
2023-02-22 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 6 |
2023-02-22 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 6 |
2023-02-22 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 6 Amendment 140F |
2023-02-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2023-02-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 274 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 229 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 228 Amendment 140D |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 215 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-02-03 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 140B |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 124 |