SD SB140 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for the increase of higher education enrolled members of the nine federally recognized tribes in South Dakota at regental institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for the increase of higher education enrolled members of the nine federally recognized tribes in South Dakota at regental institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2019 S.J. 688
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 713
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 681
2019-03-11HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 677
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 12. H.J. 670
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 669 Amendment 140xa
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 669 Amendment 140kb
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 25. H.J. 669
2019-03-06HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 667
2019-03-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 35. H.J. 667
2019-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 633
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 612
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591
2019-02-27HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3. H.J. 566
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 371
2019-02-11SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 335
2019-02-08SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320
2019-02-07SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 299
2019-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=140&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB140P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB140H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB140ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27892&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28111&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28922&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29277&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29280&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29281&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29361&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback