SD SB140 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 S.J. 792
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding an objection to a custody or visitation order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding an objection to a custody or visitation order.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseSigned by the Governor on March 9, 2018 S.J. 792
2018-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2018 S.J. 736
2018-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 712
2018-03-05HouseSigned by the President S.J. 704
2018-03-01HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 663
2018-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 618
2018-02-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-23HouseJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 570
2018-02-23HouseJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 140ja
2018-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-02-07HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 371
2018-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 391
2018-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 366
2018-02-01SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
2018-02-01SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 140ka
2018-02-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 227

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=140&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB140P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB140SJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB140HJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB140ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25148&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25148&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25441&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26303&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26464&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26644&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback