SD SB14 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 S.J. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 S.J. 354
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain administrative provisions and repeal certain obsolete provisions concerning the South Dakota Retirement System.
Title
Revise certain administrative provisions and repeal certain obsolete provisions concerning the South Dakota Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-19 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 18, 2016 S.J. 354 |
2016-02-17 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 17, 2016 S.J. 314 |
2016-02-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 405 |
2016-02-11 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 295 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 363 |
2016-02-08 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-08 | House | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. H.J. 333 |
2016-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 184 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 133 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Retirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 112 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 16 |