SD SB139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt from state regulation certain medical foster home care for veterans.
Title
Exempt from state regulation certain medical foster home care for veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 696 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 555 | |
2011-02-25 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 537 | |
2011-02-24 | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 508 | |
2011-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 321 | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 346 | |
2011-02-02 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 291 | |
2011-02-02 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 139oa | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 199 |