SD SB138 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide certain provisions regarding asbestos bankruptcy trust claims.
Title
Provide certain provisions regarding asbestos bankruptcy trust claims.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Sen. Jenna Netherton [R] |
Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 S.J. 746 |
2017-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 727 |
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 685 |
2017-03-06 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-03-06 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 648 |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 500 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 508 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 508 Amendment 138wc |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 422 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 400 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 384 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 353 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 138wb |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 138wa |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 221 |